Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Counterclaims and Cross-Claims
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain prohibition on filing a counterclaim or cross-claim in a wrongful detainer action; and authorizing a counterclaim or cross-claim to be filed in a wrongful detainer action.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0377 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Counterclaims and Cross-Claims
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-132 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM