Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the authority by which the Public Service Commission may disclose certain records provided by a transportation network company; authorizing the Commission to disclose certain records if the disclosure is made in accordance with a provision of law that requires certain licensing authorities to provide certain information to the Child Support Administration in the Department of Human Services; and providing that certain disclosed information is not subject to release under the Maryland Public Information Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2017
Legislative Date
9/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {817672/1 Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {953692/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2017 9/27/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {817672/1 Adopted 8
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 10
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Referred Economic Matters 11
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments {953692/1 Adopted 51
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/22/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM