Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to erect an exempt highway-rail grade crossing plaque at each railroad grade crossing in the State that is no longer in use by a railroad; specifying that the design and placement of a plaque shall be erected in accordance with the federal Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices; and exempting specified vehicles from the requirement to stop at specified railroad grade crossings if the railroad grade crossing has an exempt highway-rail grade crossing plaque.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0534
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1120 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 12
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 12
Text - Third - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 14
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 16
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-703, 8-644 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM