Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain carrier to provide an open enrollment period for eligible employees and dependents who gain access to new qualified health plans as a result of a permanent move and who had coverage for prenatal care or services or had medically needy coverage as described in certain federal regulations for 1 or more days during the 60 days before the date of the permanent move.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/09/2019
Legislative Date
9/09/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/09/2019 9/09/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM