Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance Benefit Cards, Prescription Benefit Cards, and Other Technology - Identification of Regulatory Agency
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, and managed care organizations to indicate in a certain manner on a health insurance benefit card or prescription benefit card or other technology which State agency regulates the policy or contract offered by the entity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance Benefit Cards, Prescription Benefit Cards, and Other Technology - Identification of Regulatory Agency
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM