Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Farm Labor Contracting - State License Requirement - Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that an individual, except under specified circumstances, be licensed by the Commission of Labor and Industry before performing a farm labor contracting service in the State for consideration; repealing a specified provision of law authorizing the Commissioner to require a farm labor contractor to post a surety bond or other security; requiring a person who performs a farm labor contracting service in the State to have a farm labor contractor certificate of registration from the U.S. Department of Labor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
10/09/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/09/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-201, 7-203, 7-301 through 7-313, 7-501, 7-502, 7-503, 7-505, 7-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM