Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Office for Children and Services to Children
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office for Children)
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions establishing the Advisory Council to the Children's Cabinet and the State Coordinating Council for Children; removing the Executive Director of the Governor's Office for Children as a member of the State Early Childhood Advisory Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services; repealing specified duties of the Governor's Office for Children; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
10/29/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/21/2015 10/29/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/21/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2016 1/25/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Favorable 10
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1601, 7-1603, 8-406, 8-417 )
(   5-590 through 5-593 )
(   8-101, 8-201, 8-202, 8-401 through 8-404, 8-405, 8-406, 8-407, 8-408 )
(   6-401, 6-402, 6-404, 6-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM