Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Astle, Brinkley, Brochin, Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Ferguson, Garagiola, Getty, Glassman, Jacobs, Jennings, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Pipkin, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Simonaire, Stone, Young, Zirkin, Kasemeyer, Jones-Rodwell, and Madaleno
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the subtraction modification under the State income tax from $5,000 to $10,000 of military retirement income received for retirees at least 65 years old on the last day of the taxable year; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0028 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {719233/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2013 1/11/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable with Amendments {719233/2 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM