Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Home Birth Safety Act
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a licensing and regulatory system for the practice of direct-entry midwifery under the State Board of Nursing; establishing the Direct-Entry Midwifery Advisory Committee; requiring the Board to set fees for the issuance and renewal of licenses; requiring continuing education, peer review, and data submission as a condition of license renewal; providing specified health care providers with specified immunity from civil liability; defining specified terms; subjecting the Act to the Maryland Program Evaluation Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0009
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/27/2015 Text - First - Maryland Home Birth Safety Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-208, 8-317, 8-6C-01, 8-6C-02, 8-6C-02.1, 8-6C-02.2, 8-6C-03 through 8-6C-26, 8-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM