Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office of Crime Control and Prevention)
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement for the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to report certain information to certain committees of the General Assembly regarding interrogation rooms; requiring the Office to place on its website in an easily accessible location a filterable data display showing all data collected and a summary relating to the establishment of certain interrogation rooms; requiring the Office to provide a paper copy of certain information under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/18/2017
Legislative Date
9/18/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {742414/2 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (115-2)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/18/2017 9/18/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 32
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Judiciary 33
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {742414/2 Adopted 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (115-2) 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (119-0) 69
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-219, 2-404 )
(   2-514, 3-507 )
(   13-941 )
(   25-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM