Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing requirements that fees for the licensure and permitting of behavioral health programs and facilities, medical laboratories, tissue banks, and health care facilities be set by the Secretary of Health; repealing certain provisions of law regarding the renewal of certain licenses and permits for certain health programs and facilities; requiring a person acquiring a nursing home to provide the Department with written notice of the acquisition; requiring a nursing home to notify the Department of certain changes within 30 days; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2017
Legislative Date
9/26/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/30 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {883123/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2017 9/26/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable 9
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Motion Special Order until 1/30 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 9
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Favorable Adopted 15
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Floor Amendment {883123/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 15
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Text - Third - Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 18
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Text - Chapter - Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-202, 17-204, 17-207, 17-209, 17-214, 17-2A-02, 17-2A-06, 17-2A-08, 17-304, 17-307, 17-310, 17-506, 17-508, 19-1203, 19-1401.1, 19-1401.2, 19-1410, 19-1804.1, 19-1805, 19-2001, 19-2002, 19-319.1, 19-320, 19-323, 19-3B-04, 19-3B-05, 19-404, 19-4A-03, 19-4B-04, 19-907, 19-910, 20-109, 7.5-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM