Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Small and Minority Design Firm Participation in State Procurement
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Small and Minority Design Firm Participation in State Procurement; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to determine specific measures to ensure equitable participation by small and minority design firms in State-funded projects and other specified measures; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274036/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {274036/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM