Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Low Intensity Support Services - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "low intensity support services" as it relates to the Low Intensity Support Services Program in the Developmental Disabilities Administration to include a child or an adult who is living in the home, or an adult who is living in the community, and who has a severe chronic disability that is attributable to a physical or mental impairment, other than the sole diagnosis of mental illness, or to a combination of physical and mental impairments and is likely to continue indefinitely; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0231
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {537676/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {537676/1 Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 24
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 26
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM