Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Definitions of Provider and Health Care Services
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "health care services" and altering the definition of "provider" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing provider panels of certain health insurance carriers.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Definitions of Provider and Health Care Services
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM