Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Records Checks - Fingerprint Submission Exception
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing that the Secretary of State Police is not required to submit certain fingerprints with a certain application for a criminal history records check if the applicant's fingerprints are already on file with the Department of State Police.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1153 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Handgun Permits - Criminal History Records Checks - Fingerprint Submission Exception
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM