Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of a property tax exemption for dwelling houses owned by specified blind individuals or surviving spouses of blind individuals from $15,000 of the assessed value of the dwelling to $30,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0021
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0006 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2013
Legislative Date
1/15/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2013 1/15/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 21
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Second Reading Passed 21
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 23
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 26
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM