Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Incapacity to Make Informed Decision - Certification by Psychologist
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the certification requirement regarding a patient's incapacity to make an informed decision regarding treatment to allow the second individual making the certification to be a psychologist, rather than a second physician; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0067
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 21
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Second Reading Passed 21
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (40-5) 23
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 26
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM