Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's Family
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the medical necessity exemption from the prohibition against operating specified vehicles with window tinting to apply the exemption to a member of the vehicle owner's immediate family; clarifying language; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0097
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM