Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the State income tax rates imposed on married couples filing a joint income tax return and for specified individuals with income between $150,000 and $500,000; increasing the amount allowed as a deduction for specified exemptions for married couples and specified individuals to twice the amount allowed as a deduction for specified individuals; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0315
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0769 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM