Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-CC (Corporate Club/Conference Center) License
Sponsored by
Senators Glassman and Jacobs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class H-CC (corporate club/conference center) license in Harford County; authorizing the Liquor Control Board to issue the license for an establishment that meets specified requirements; requiring that a corporate dining room in a licensed establishment meets specified requirements; authorizing a holder of the license to engage in specified activities; specifying a license fee of $3,000; providing that not more than six licenses be in effect at a time; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 23
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 28
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM