Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Continuing Course of Conduct With a Child - Unit of Prosecution
Sponsored by
Senators Lee and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that acts constituting a continuing course of unlawful sexual conduct with a victim under the age of 14 years that occur in separate periods of 90 days or more are separate violations.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0712
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {968373/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Continuing Course of Conduct With a Child - Unit of Prosecution
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {968373/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Continuing Course of Conduct With a Child - Unit of Prosecution
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Referred Judiciary 32
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 58
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Continuing Course of Conduct With a Child - Unit of Prosecution
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM