Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Shielding - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to request that specified court records and police records relating to a specified conviction be shielded at a specified time; providing that, if a specified person is convicted of a new crime during a specified time period, a specified original conviction is not eligible for shielding unless the new conviction becomes eligible for shielding; requiring the Court of Appeals, by rule, to establish procedures relating to the filing of a specified request for shielding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301 through 10-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM