Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a method of electing judges to the circuit court on a nonpartisan basis, without regard to political party affiliation; establishing a primary election for candidates for nomination for a circuit court judgeship to be administered in a certain manner under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0744 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 3
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 5-301, 5-703, 5-703.1, 5-706, 8-901 through 8-905, 9-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM