Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin, Lee, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Kelley, Norman, Ramirez, Ready, and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that certain persons who are required to provide certain notice or make certain reports of suspected child abuse or neglect may not knowingly fail to give the notice or make the report if the person has actual knowledge of the abuse or neglect; establishing the misdemeanor of knowing failure to report child abuse or neglect under certain circumstances; and providing a penalty of a fine not to exceed $1,000 or imprisonment of up to 6 months or both for a violation of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0500
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0135 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468177/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {468177/1 Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Text - Third - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Judiciary 23
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-602.2 )
(   5-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM