Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, DeGrange, Eckardt, Hershey, Jennings, King, Manno, Mathias, and Miller
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county from receiving specified revenues derived from a State forest or park reserve and concession operations within a county if the county receives specified payments in a fiscal year; requiring specified payments to counties for State forests, parks, and wildlife management areas that are exempt from the property tax; providing for a payment of $250,000 for each open space unit in the county beginning in fiscal year 2017; establishing the manner in which land is considered in determining the amount of the payment; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1091
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
No recommendation by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Motion place bill on Second Reading (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {809131/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Kagan) Rejected
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 No recommendation by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Motion place bill on Second Reading (Senator Edwards) Adopted 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {809131/1 Adopted 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Kagan) Rejected 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 54
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-1201, 5-212, 5-212.1, 5-215 )
(   6.5-101 through 6.5-301, 6-102, 7-210, 7-211, 7-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM