Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solar Energy Grant Program - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing cooperative housing corporations, councils of unit owners of condominiums, and homeowners associations to receive grants for a portion of the costs of acquiring and installing photovoltaic property and solar water heating property under the Solar Energy Grant Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM