Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime - Diminution Credits and Sentencing
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Muse, and Norman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the earning of diminution credits to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate committed to the custody of the Commissioner of Correction or sentenced to a term of imprisonment in a local correctional facility who is serving a sentence for the use of specified firearms in the commission of specified crimes; prohibiting a court from suspending any part of a mandatory minimum sentence of five years; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0164 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-502, 3-702 )
(   4-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM