Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Board of Physicians - Reinstatement of Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Physicians to reconsider, under specified circumstances, the suspension or revocation of an individual's license to practice medicine, that is based solely on a specified ground for discipline relating to disciplinary action by a licensing or disciplinary authority in another state, on the request of the individual.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174232/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2014 1/10/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {174232/1 Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 28
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM