Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exception to the requirement that an individual be licensed by the Board of Pharmacy before the individual may practice pharmacy in the State; and requiring a dentist, physician, or podiatrist who dispenses a prescription drug or device in the course of treating a patient at a medical facility or clinic that specializes in the treatment of medical cases reimbursable through workers' compensation insurance to obtain a dispensing permit and meet other requirements.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1237
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 26
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 28
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 60A
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM