Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a prohibition against tax sales in Baltimore City for nonpayment of specified environmental citations to apply the prohibition only if the total amount of unpaid environmental citations is less than $1,000; authorizing tax sales in Baltimore City for nonpayment of specified environmental citations only after exhaustion of administrative and judicial rights of appeal; requiring Baltimore City to submit a specified report on the implementation of the Act to specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {449033/1
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {449033/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {449033/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {523821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {595466/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2014 1/10/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {449033/1 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 38
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {449033/1 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 39
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {449033/1 Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {523821/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 44
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {595466/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM