Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Telephone Service - Charges for Directory Assistance
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Forehand, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Mathias, McFadden, Montgomery, and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified residential customers are entitled to only two directory assistance calls each month without charge; requiring the Public Service Commission to approve other charges for directory assistance, subject to an exception; and repealing a provision that authorizes the Commission to establish additional exemptions from directory assistance charges.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0677 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397677/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-31)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments {397677/1 Report Adopted 21
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 23
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 26
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (104-31) 47
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Returned Passed 46
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM