Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business and Economic Development - Foreign Trade Zones - Information
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Business and Economic Development to include on the Web site of the Department specified information relating to foreign trade zones; and defining "foreign trade zone".
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2014 1/10/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 13
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 13
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 15
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 17
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM