Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the annual salary of the State's Attorney of Harford County to be equal to the salary of a judge of the District Court of Maryland; repealing a specified salary adjustment method; providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the State's Attorney of Harford County while serving in a term of office before the effective date of the Act; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {968677/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {968677/1 Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 23
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM