Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Young, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Steering Committee of the Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators; and requiring the Steering Committee to review, or request that the Alliance review, the content and monitor the implementation of the training objectives and curriculum adopted by the Police Training Commission for a community inclusion training program at least once every 4 years or more frequently if requested by the Commission.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0022
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0848 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {887479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments {887479/1 Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 29
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 55
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-502, 7-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM