Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish a process through which an individual who purchases a license, permit, or registration through the electronic licensing system may make a voluntary monetary donation to the Chesapeake Bay Trust and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund at the time the license, permit, or registration is purchased; requiring the Department to collect the donations made electronically under the Act and distribute the proceeds in a certain manner; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0104
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {644635/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {644635/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page