Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Bookstore License
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a bookstore beer and wine license in the City of Annapolis; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a certain establishment; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell beer and wine to a bookstore customer for on-premises consumption during a public lecture, reading, discussion, or similar bookstore event; prohibiting the average daily receipts from the sale of alcoholic beverages at the bookstore from exceeding 17% of average daily receipts; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1678
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Bookstore License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Bookstore License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Bookstore License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Bookstore License
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Bookstore License
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 68
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Text - Chapter - City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Bookstore License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1001, 10-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM