Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Fiscal Impact Statements for Proposed Regulations
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law to clarify that a promulgating unit is required to submit a specified fiscal impact statement with a proposed regulation to the Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review and the Department of Legislative Services; and altering a specified provision of law to prohibit a unit from adopting a proposed regulation until after a specified fiscal impact statement is submitted with the proposed regulation to the Committee for preliminary review.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0026
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-110, 10-111, 10-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM