Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a disciplinary committee of the State Board of Nursing to grant and deny licenses and certificates and take specified disciplinary action against licensees and certificate holders; authorizing the Board to establish one or more disciplinary committees to conduct specified hearings and issue final decisions or orders under specified provisions of law; authorizing the Board to delegate authority to conduct a hearing and issue a final decision or order to a disciplinary committee; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0070
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-316 through 8-318, 8-503.1, 8-6A-10, 8-6A-10.1, 8-6A-11, 8-6B-18 through 8-6B-21 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM