Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Eckardt, Mathias, and Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $750 to $1,500 the maximum allowable amount of a credit against the State income tax that provides $5 for each bushel of oyster shells recycled during the taxable year; extending the termination date of the credit to the end of June 30, 2023; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0572
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {659235/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {885168/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Sunset Extension
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {659235/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Repeal
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 27
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 28
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {885168/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Text - Chapter -
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-724.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM