Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Establishment of a Sickle Cell Disease Outreach Program
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Conway, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, Lee, Mathias, McFadden, Montgomery, Pugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish, before June 1, 2016, a specified sickle cell disease outreach program; requiring that the program provide specified programs, support, and services.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0823
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1405 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 13
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM