Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Klausmeier, Montgomery, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the health care providers who provide consultation, diagnosis, and treatment of a mental or emotional disorder to which minors who are 16 years old and older have the same capacity as an adult to consent; providing that the capacity to consent does not include the capacity to refuse consultation, diagnosis, or treatment for a mental or emotional disorder by health care providers for which a specified individual has given consent; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0662
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677472/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {156983/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-15)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {677472/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 28
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {156983/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-15) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM