Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility Verification and Application
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Ferguson, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, McFadden, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the dates by which specified applications for the homestead property tax credit for specified dwellings are required to be filed with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; altering the taxable years in which the tax credit may not be granted for specified dwellings under specified circumstances; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0128
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {539134/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {539134/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 35
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM