Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "property of another" as used in specified provisions prohibiting arson, burning, and the malicious destruction of property to conform with the definition found in provisions relating to theft and related crimes; and clarifying that the "property of another" includes a tenant by the entirety.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0404 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101, 6-301, 7-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM