Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation, on or before February 1, 2019, and at least every 3 years thereafter, to identify homeowners who may be eligible for but have failed to apply for a certain homestead property tax credit; and requiring the Department to contact each homeowner identified under the Act by mail to inform the homeowner that the homeowner may be eligible for the property tax credit and how to apply for the credit.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0305
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM