Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Ferguson, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, and Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making provisions of law authorizing access to birth and adoption records by specified adoptees and biological parents applicable to adoptions in which a juvenile court entered an order for adoption before January 1, 2000; repealing provisions of law limiting, under specified circumstances, access to specified information in birth and adoption records by adoptees and biological parents for adoptions in which a juvenile court entered an order for adoption on or after January 1, 2000, except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0022
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0719 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/01/2013 3/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-321, 5-339, 5-351, 5-359, 5-3A-19, 5-3A-35, 5-3A-42, 5-3B-21, 5-3B-29, 5-4B-01, 5-4B-02, 5-4B-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM