Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Condominiums - Governing Documents - Claims Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making unenforceable a provision of a declaration, bylaw, contract for sale of a unit, or other instrument made by a developer relating to residential condominiums that purports to shorten the statute of limitations for any warranty claim or other specified claims, purports to waive the application of an accrual date for claims, operates to prevent the filing of a lawsuit or other proceeding within a statute of limitations, or requires the assertion of a claim within a shorter time period than the applicable statute of limitations; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0725 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {948379/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {948379/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 29
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-134.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM