Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Carozza, Eckardt, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the vehicle excise tax credit for the purchase of certain plug-in electric drive vehicles to include the purchase of certain fuel cell electric vehicles; providing that the credit for a fuel cell electric vehicle may not exceed $3,000; changing the name of the Maryland Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council to the Maryland Zero Emission Vehicle Infrastructure Council; altering the membership and required activities of the Council; requiring the Council to issue an interim report on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0151
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Cars Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Clean Cars Act of 2019
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-125.1, 13-815 )
(   2011, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2017 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM