Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug and Medical Supply Access and Affordability Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Brochin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to convene a workgroup to study the advisability of the State forming a generic drugs and medical supplies purchasing cooperative and establishing Maryland as an open formulary State; requiring the workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019; terminating the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug and Medical Supply Access and Affordability Workgroup
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM