Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel Recruitment Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the recruitment and appointment process for certain positions in the skilled service or professional service in the State Personnel Management System under certain circumstances; requiring an appointing authority initiating a certain recruitment and appointment to notify the Department of Budget and Management of the recruitment; repealing certain time frames for the preparation of certain job announcements by certain appointing authorities for a certain position in State government; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0158
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel Recruitment Modernization Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Personnel Recruitment Modernization Act of 2019
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-201, 7-203, 7-204, 7-205, 7-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM