Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Retirement Tax Fairness Act of 2019
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Eckardt, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from certain retirement plans within a certain subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain individuals who are at least certain ages, are disabled or whose spouse is disabled, or are retired correctional officers, law enforcement officers, or fire, rescue, or emergency serves personnel; limiting the cumulative or total amount of certain subtractions to the maximum annual benefit under the Social Security Act less certain payments; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0149
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Retirement Tax Fairness Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Retirement Tax Fairness Act of 2019
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM